THE ATCH LENCH GRAVEYARD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We care for the graveyard of the former Baptist Chapel at Atch Lench, nr Evesham, Worcs, which is in a conservation area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 15 May 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas John Hughes | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marie Morris | Trustee | 14 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
LUCY KATHERINE BOMFORD | Trustee | 15 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR S J WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR J G BOMFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR R H R BOMFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.74k | £2.59k | £2.44k | £3.85k | £6.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.20k | £696 | £2.13k | £1.39k | £3.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 04 APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
(1) TO ENSURE THE LONG-TERM MANAGEMENT, CARE AND MAINTENANCE OF A GRAVEYARD OF THE FORMER ATCH LENCH BAPTIST CHAPEL (IN ATCH LENCH, NEAR EVESHAM, WORCESTERSHIRE) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE FAMILIES CONCERNED AND AS A VISUAL AMENITY FOR THE COMMUNITY. (2) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY AT ANY TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
ATCH LENCH, NEAR EVESHAM, WORCESTERSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SPRING HILL HOUSE
SALTERS LANE
LOWER MOOR
PERSHORE
WR10 2PE
- Phone:
- 01386 861390
- Email:
- JGBOMFORD@AOL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window