HEARING CONCERN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hearing Concern provide a range of services and activities to promote its mission of enabling hard of hearing people to participate fully in society
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 November 2002: Standard registration
- 09 December 2008: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 09 December 2008: Funds transferred to 264809 HEARING LINK
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £434.07k | £562.24k | £509.18k | £444.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £479.49k | £423.94k | £657.93k | £820.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 22 October 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 14 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 14 September 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 14 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 03 July 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 14 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 22 August 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 21 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 23 July 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21ST JUNE 2002
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST AND PROMOTE ALL ACTIVITIES THAT RELIEVE AND SUPPORT HARD OF HEARING PEOPLE AND TO ASSIST IN THE PREVENTION OF DEAFNESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window