BELFORD COMMUNITY GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run a used goods/second hand shop within the Belford Community Building which raises funds for the charity. We also run a Hidden History Museum and Exhibition within the old Reading Rooms. We currently run a community gym. We award monies to local causes on application to the Trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £15,935 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northumberland
Governance
- 20 January 2004: Standard registration
- 29 August 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 29 August 2024: Funds transferred to 1199530 BELFORD COMMUNITY GROUP CIO
- BELFORD DEVELOPMENT TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.21k | £40.02k | £36.02k | £34.08k | £37.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.19k | £38.46k | £32.69k | £29.77k | £26.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/06/2003 AS AMENDED ON 10/10/2014 AS AMENDED ON 20/10/2014 AS AMENDED ON 05 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
BELFORD COMMUNITY GROUP IS ESTABLISHED FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS WILL BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE PARISHES OF BELFORD AND MIDDLETON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, AS THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
THE PARISHES OF BELFORD AND MIDDLETON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA SUCH AS THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES MAY SUBSEQUENTLY DETERMINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window