Accounts and annual returns THE DX CLUB

Charity Number: 1105261
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 11 June 2024 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 11 June 2024 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 23 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 23 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 15 September 2022 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 15 September 2022 107 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 26 October 2021 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 26 October 2021 148 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 18 August 2020 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 18 August 2020 79 days late Download Open in new window