CHRISTIAN BROADCASTING NETWORK (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of Christian Religion by TV broadcasts, CD's, DVD's, Christian resources and humanitarian aid.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,790,097
Donations and legacies | £1.78m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £6.26k | |
Investments | £1.95k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,784,961
Raising funds | £4.94k | |
Charitable activities | £1.78m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £4.94k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.78m | |
Retained for future use | £5.14k |
People

30 Employee(s)
3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bulgaria
- Croatia
- Israel
- Netherlands
- Poland
- Portugal
- Ukraine
Governance
- 21 January 2004: Standard registration
- 700 CLUB OPERATION BLESSING (Working name)
- CBN CHRISTIAN BROADCASTING NETWORK (Working name)
- CBN Europe (Working name)
- ORPHAN'S PROMISE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rhonda Kay Jewell | Trustee | 29 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Marie Smith | Trustee | 18 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
KIM HAROLD MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.22m | £1.24m | £1.41m | £1.57m | £1.79m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.26m | £1.19m | £1.20m | £1.69m | £1.78m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.16m | £1.17m | £1.39m | £1.57m | £1.78m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £62.17k | £74.40k | £25.76k | £7.49k | £6.26k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £653 | £581 | £111 | £1.06k | £1.95k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.21m | £1.16m | £1.18m | £1.68m | £1.78m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £51.11k | £37.77k | £16.30k | £9.66k | £4.94k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.91k | £7.12k | £7.32k | £7.69k | £8.07k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £267.28k | £162.40k | £176.14k | £125.82k | £149.11k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £23.07k | £22.39k | £50.40k | £74.96k | £95.17k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £1 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £162.20k | £210.80k | £399.43k | £269.37k | £252.00k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £23.57k | £20.30k | £20.91k | £28.10k | £25.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 13 JUNE 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS") ARE: (I) TO PROMULGATE THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AND THE TRUTHS OF THE HOLY BIBLE BY WHATEVER MEANS POSSIBLE INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE FOLLOWING: (A) THE PRODUCTION, BROADCAST AND DISTRIBUTION OF RELIGIOUS AND EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AND MATERIALS IN OR ON BOOKS, TRACTS, PAMPHLETS, FILMS, TAPES, SLIDES, WORLD WIDE WEB (INTERNET), OR ANY OTHER AUDIO OR VISUAL DEVICES, MEANS OR MEDIA, WHETHER NOW KNOWN OR HEREAFTER DEVISED; (B) THE FINANCIAL SUPPORT OF INDIVIDUALS OR ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN RELIGIOUS, HUMANITARIAN, EDUCATIONAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE WORK IN AND OUTSIDE THE UNITED KINGDOM; (C) THE DONATION OF MONEY AND SUPPLIES, AND THE PROVISION OF SERVICES FOR THE RELIEF OF HUMAN NEED AND SUFFERING IN ALL PARTS OF THE WORLD, INCLUDING THE UNITED KINGDOM; (D) THE ENCOURAGEMENT BY EVERY MEANS, INCLUDING THE DONATION OF MONEY AND EQUIPMENT, OF RADIO AND TELEVISION BROADCASTING, AND THE PRODUCTION OF RELIGIOUS AND EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES, WHICH CONVEYS RELIGIOUS TRUTH; (E) THE PROVISION OF MORAL AND SPIRITUAL ADVICE, SUPPORT AND PRAYER TO INDIVIDUALS WHO CONTACT THE CHARITY VIA TELEPHONE, LETTER, INTERNET, BY THE STAFF AND VOLUNTEERS; AND/OR (II) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES, WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE, AS THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
IN AND OUTSIDE OF THE UNITED KINDOM AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
The 700 Club
PO BOX 700
HEREFORD
HR1 9EW
- Phone:
- 03005610700
- Email:
- info@cbn.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window