Accounts and annual returns GREENFIELDS JUNIOR SCHOOL PTFA

Charity Number: 1093055
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 April 2022 275 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 April 2022 640 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 February 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required