SPRAC
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 09 August 2002: Standard registration
- 20 May 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ST PHILLIPS RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION COMMUNITY COMPUTERS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 01/04/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £193.90k | £206.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £180.56k | £193.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2005 | 19 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 07 March 2005 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 07 March 2005 | 35 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 FEBRUARY 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY, IN PARTICULAR FOR PERSONS WITH DISABILITY, THE ELDERLY, UNEMPLOYED OR OTHERS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COURSES AND THE LOAN OF AND ACCESS TO COMPUTER EQUIPMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window