Financial history THE SOUTH WALES BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1093079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £15.00k £20.27k £0 £305 £23.51k
Total expenditure £4.28k £20.76k £3.66k £5.72k £4.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A