Accounts and annual returns SOUTHBANK ENTERPRISE TRUST LTD.

Charity Number: 1100603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 March 2024 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 March 2024 49 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 March 2023 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 March 2023 55 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 March 2022 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 April 2021 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required