Financial history SOUTHBANK ENTERPRISE TRUST LTD.

Charity Number: 1100603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.55k £24.95k £40.61k £42.49k £48.31k
Total expenditure £20.59k £28.63k £38.04k £40.46k £53.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A