THE PLYMOUTH U3A

Charity number: 1094085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Established to promote lifelong learning accessible to all who are not in full time employment. No qualification is required to join and no qualifications are given. Groups are established to reflect the members' interests and are led by members of the u3a. We are essentially a social organisation with more than 80 different groups that offer every opportunity to LEARN, LAUGH,LIVE.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £28,134
Total expenditure: £23,430

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Plymouth City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 October 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lorraine Robinson Chair 10 July 2023
None on record
John Gilchrist Jarvis Trustee 08 July 2024
None on record
Susan Dallas Trustee 08 July 2024
None on record
Robert Edwin Martin Trustee 05 December 2022
None on record
Margaret Thompson Trustee 14 October 2022
None on record
David Hamm Trustee 14 October 2022
None on record
Martin John Cox Trustee 11 July 2022
None on record
Michael Parle Trustee 04 May 2021
None on record
Ms Ann Cox Trustee 04 January 2021
None on record
Ms Alyson Smith Trustee 04 January 2021
None on record
Mr Brian Mathieson Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £27.00k £13.43k £14.71k £13.28k £28.13k
Total expenditure £25.87k £10.39k £12.08k £17.39k £23.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 18 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 March 2024 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 Moor View Terrace
PLYMOUTH
PL4 7EB
Phone:
01752241946