Trustees MANNA HOUSE PROJECT

Charity Number: 1096164
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charles Anthony Cowling Reverend Chair 08 April 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KIRKBY STEPHEN WITH MALLERSTANG, CROSBY GARRETT AND SOULBY
Received: On time
MANNA HOUSE (CUMBRIA)
Received: On time
Dr Susan Williamson Trustee 20 November 2024
MANNA HOUSE (CUMBRIA)
Received: On time
Matthew William Fowler Trustee 10 July 2024
MANNA HOUSE (CUMBRIA)
Received: On time
Lee Crampton Trustee 13 September 2023
MANNA HOUSE (CUMBRIA)
Received: On time
Dr Karen Green Trustee 01 November 2022
MANNA HOUSE (CUMBRIA)
Received: On time
Susan Elizabeth Bagot Trustee 01 November 2022
MANNA HOUSE (CUMBRIA)
Received: On time
Stephen Alan Taylor Trustee 23 September 2021
MANNA HOUSE (CUMBRIA)
Received: On time
Judith Robinson Trustee 18 September 2018
MANNA HOUSE (CUMBRIA)
Received: On time
FIONA CLARE NELSON Trustee 21 March 2017
None on record