Financial history BOOMERANG KIDS

Charity number: 1096356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £708.58k £780.90k £812.77k £869.12k £853.82k
Total expenditure £677.25k £787.40k £803.43k £829.89k £867.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £8.80k £7.05k
Income from government grants £239.20k £230.39k £219.63k £8.70k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £579 £0 £20.50k £7.35k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £660.05k £733.06k £803.36k £848.42k £846.24k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £185 £5 £476 £201 £237
Income - Other £48.35k £47.26k £8.93k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £7.35k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £677.25k £787.40k £803.43k £829.89k £867.32k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.49k £6.44k £10.01k £12.55k £9.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0