Accounts and annual returns RAAD LTD

Charity number: 1098931
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2012 08 April 2013 39 days late
Annual return 30 April 2011 24 February 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2011 10 November 2011 On Time