Financial history RAAD LTD

Charity number: 1098931
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2007 30/04/2008 30/04/2009 30/04/2010 30/04/2011
Total gross income £199.36k £175.65k £231.36k £125.69k £126.54k
Total expenditure £162.58k £152.95k £224.83k £115.19k £119.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A