Financial history ATMA VIGNANI DADA BHAGWAN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1097197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £934.97k £1.01m £533.19k £615.16k £854.90k
Total expenditure £563.98k £410.05k £731.86k £509.42k £1.02m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £765.55k £1.01m £532.93k £610.18k £847.15k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £167.05k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.36k £1.32k £107 £2.14k £7.75k
Income - Other £0 £0 £150 £2.84k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £563.98k £410.05k £731.86k £482.01k £1.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £954 £4.80k £4.80k £4.00k £5.73k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £478.01k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £27.41k £0