BOLTON LIONS CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of Bolton Lions Club, is to raise money through various activities, such as galas, raffles, fetes and other fund raising events, funds are also boosted through donations given. The club will look favourably at any request for aid (cash or manpower) and in most cases, these requests are granted.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bolton
Governance
- 12 February 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Crompton | Chair | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Dipankar Mukherjee | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
MR MURPHY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.59k | £47.43k | £19.83k | £25.55k | £42.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.22k | £42.33k | £24.75k | £21.99k | £25.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 June 2024 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 June 2024 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 August 2022 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 August 2022 | 120 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 MAY 2002 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 22 OCTOBER 2002
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES WHETHER FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY INDIVIDUAL OR GROUP OF PEOPLE OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY OTHER ORGANISATION ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ("THE OBJECTS") PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL NOT APPLY THE TRUST FUND OR ANY PART THEREOF WITHOUT FIRST OBTAINING THE APPROVAL OF THE LIONS CLUB AT A LIONS CLUB MEETING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRCATICE BOLTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Avondale Road
Farnworth
Bolton
BL4 0PA
- Phone:
- 07487266659
- Email:
- contact@boltonlions.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window