Accounts and annual returns CHRISTIAN REVIVAL CENTRE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1094185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 14 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 14 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 10 April 2025 345 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 10 April 2025 345 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 04 July 2023 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 04 July 2023 65 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 02 June 2022 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 02 June 2022 33 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 May 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 12 May 2021 12 days late Download Open in new window