STEMPOINT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
STEMPOINT is an educational charity whose aim is to inspire young people in Science, Technology, Engineering and Maths. We do this by engaging young people in memorable experiences and by introducing them to STEM professionals. We have more than 35 years experience of working at the interface of education and local STEM based business, industry and research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £3,100 from 1 government contract(s) and £7,100 from 4000 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 October 2002: Standard registration
- SETPOINT HERTFORDSHIRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr DAVID STOREY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Roberts | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Georgia Mitrousia | Trustee | 29 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Allan Bartholomeusz | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Hutchings | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Benjamin Burningham | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Harrison Hawkins | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Baxter | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Maskrey | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Cole | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony McKay | Trustee | 17 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £275.12k | £325.38k | £354.99k | £411.74k | £387.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £270.08k | £269.34k | £301.80k | £426.67k | £459.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.10k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 21 JUNE 2002. as amended on 08 Feb 2023 as amended on 27 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
4. OBJECTS The Objects for which the Charity is established are: 4.1 To advance the theoretical and practical education of principally young people in science, technology, engineering and mathematics, working with schools and business. 4.2 To advance the public and in particular students’ understanding of science, engineering, technology and related subjects and the role of education in this. 4.3 The area of benefit shall be principally the East of England, but may extend further within the UK at the discretion of the Trustees. 4.4 The Charity shall also advance such other charitable purposes, which are beneficial to the public and which are consistent with the Objects stated above as the Trustees shall in their absolute discretion determine. 4.5 This Article 4 may be amended subject to obtaining the prior consent of the Charity Commission as required by section 64 of the Charities Act 1993 (as amend in 2006, and as amended from time to time).
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
at MBDA
Six Hills Way
STEVENAGE
Hertfordshire
SG1 2DA
- Phone:
- (0) 1438 419450
- Email:
- admin@stempoint.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window