HILLINGDON SOMALI WOMEN'S GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hillingdon Somali Women's group provides a variety of services to Somali women and their families. A lot the women we help are unemployed due to lack of relevant skills and communication barries. We provide the following services Advice --- employment, benefits and education. IT and ESOL Courses---- to equip our clients with skills to help them seek employment. After school club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ealing
- Harrow
- Hillingdon
- Hounslow
Governance
- 12 November 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sulekha Jama | Trustee | 31 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
NAJMA H SAID | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HIBO JAMA MOHAMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ASHA YUSSUF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LEYLA MOHAMED ALI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.92k | £11.71k | £28.69k | £27.46k | £23.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.91k | £15.45k | £25.73k | £25.90k | £25.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £11.50k | £10.00k | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 May 2024 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
11 May 2024 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
06 February 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 February 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 29 APRIL 2002.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS FORMED ARE:- 1. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE SOMALI COMMUNITY AND IN PARTICULAR THE WOMEN AND CHILDREN OF THAT COMMUNITY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HILLINGDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS ('THE BENEFICIARIES') BY ADVANC0ING EDUCATION AND PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID BENEFICIARIES AND 2. FOR THE RELIEF IN NEED OF THE SAID BENEFICIARIES BY THE PROVISION OF FREE AND CONFIDENTIAL ADVICE, ADVOCACY AND OTHER SERVICES IN MATTERS SUCH AS MONEY, DEBTS, WELFARE BENEFITS, HOUSING, HEALTH, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON - HILLINGDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 EAST AVENUE
HAYES
MIDDLESEX
UB3 2HP
- Phone:
- 02085738225
- Email:
- contact@hswg.org
- Website:
-
hswg.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window