PORT NAVAS VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a meeting place for the residents,supporting their requests Educational lectures, Art and other educationaql classes Art exhibitions Fund raising community activities Providing a social focal point for the village of Port Navas Improving the conditions of life for the inhabitants Providing venues for community gatherings in and around Port Navas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 25 October 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Clarke | Chair | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nichola Coleman | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter GB Jones | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Roeland de Greef | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Clarke | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Clarke | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Verena Newton | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Frost | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE JONES | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
DILYS GARDINER | Trustee | 11 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.81k | £2.22k | £18.49k | £3.50k | £2.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.72k | £1.74k | £828 | £1.86k | £4.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £16.26k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 November 2022 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 JANUARY 2002
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY AND THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF PORT NAVAS AND THE PARISH OF CONSTANTINE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE OF THE PROPERTY FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE CONSTANTINE PARISH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Creek Cottage
Quay Road
Port Navas,Constantine
FALMOUTH
Cornwall
TR11 5RY
- Phone:
- 01326340581
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window