ALEXANDRA PARK SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association organises fundraising events in order to support Alexandra Park School by donating funds for school trips, books, clubs and equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Haringey
Governance
- 28 August 2002: Standard registration
- APSA (Working name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Wiseman | Chair | 22 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Lee Lewis | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Francesca Agyeman | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Hancock | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda May | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Beecher | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oriane Kets de Vries | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Platt | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.78k | £5.80k | £2.94k | £8.32k | £9.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £732 | £123 | £128 | £8.77k | £8.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 November 2021 | 152 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
ALEXANDRA PARK SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Alexandra Park Secondary School
Bidwell Gardens
LONDON
N11 2AZ
- Phone:
- 02088264880
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window