Accounts and annual returns WILLOWS PTA

Charity number: 1094324
Charity reporting is up to date (70 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 08 September 2024 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 January 2024 204 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 January 2023 206 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 March 2022 267 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 January 2021 207 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 23 January 2021 207 days late Download Open in new window