Financial history WOLVERHAMPTON ELDER ASIANS AND DISABLED

Charity number: 1096653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £16.91k £19.82k £6.59k £3.72k £12.17k
Total expenditure £10.62k £11.48k £12.40k £13.07k £12.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.67k £7.19k N/A N/A N/A