WOLVERHAMPTON ELDER ASIANS AND DISABLED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
we provide a day drop in centre with social, educational and recreational activities. we reduce isolation of elders by providing awareness raising sessions, advice and information and befriending. we also provide carer support. we arrange trips and outings as well as in house activities. We also provide mental health awareness project which provides support and assistance for carers and sufferers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 24 March 2003: Standard registration
- W.E.A.D. (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
pawan kohli | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
kamaljit manku | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarabjit gill | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
harinder singh Mangat | Trustee | 30 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
INDERJIT KAUR HANSPAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOGINDER SINGH BHAMBRA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.91k | £19.82k | £6.59k | £3.72k | £12.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.62k | £11.48k | £12.40k | £13.07k | £12.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.67k | £7.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 MARCH 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 30 DECEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
WITHIN WOLVERHAMPTON AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE OBJECTIVE FOR THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, DISABLED AND/OR ELDERLY PEOPLE FROM ETHNIC MINORITY COMMUNITIES BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE COMMUNITY AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
WOLVERHAMPTON, WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Base 25
29-31 Temple street
Wolverhampton
WV2 4AN
- Phone:
- 01902448552
- Email:
- elderasians@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window