UTTOXETER CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity pursues the study and practice of choral music, in order to foster public knowledge and appreciation of such music, by means of public performance and also other charitable purposes, in particular but not exclusively, by the making of charitable donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 14 October 2002: Standard registration
- 13 January 2023: Funds received from 501147 BURTON UPON TRENT AND DISTRICT ARTS COUNCIL
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew James Crosse | Chair | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Flint | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Broad | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Judith Margaret Crosse | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.81k | £3.11k | £1.51k | £8.18k | £12.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.31k | £210 | £2.36k | £8.20k | £13.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 APRIL 2002 AS AMENDED 18 MAY 2002 AND 12 SEPTEMBER 2002 as amended on 29 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
3.1 THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE. 3.2 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE MAKING OF CHARITABLE DONATIONS.
Area of benefit
UTTOXETER, STAFFORDSHIRE,DERBYSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Post Office
Boylestone
ASHBOURNE
Derbyshire
DE6 5AA
- Phone:
- 01283732858
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window