Accounts and annual returns THE GILFORD PATHWAY

Charity number: 1098899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 July 2024 13 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2023 31 July 2024 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2022 19 February 2024 265 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2021 20 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2020 11 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2020 Not Required