Financial history THE GILFORD PATHWAY

Charity number: 1098899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/07/2020 30/07/2021 30/07/2022 30/07/2023 30/07/2024
Total gross income £760 £1.27k £2.58k £2.60k £0
Total expenditure £79 £1.03k £2.85k £3.46k £2.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A