THE HOUSE OF GENESIS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Company are: - To promote for the benefit of the public, the rehabilitation of the homeless and ex-prisoners, and to relieve poverty by the provision of accommodation, support & advice - To advance religion for the benefit of the public in such a way that its message becomes accessible and comprehensible to those whom the Company seeks to assist.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £204,011 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 08 January 2003: Standard registration
- HOUSE OF GENESIS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN LUSHER MBA | Chair |
|
||||||
Caroline Nicola Hill | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Cronk | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Ernest Cary | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Melanie Taplin | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN JOHN GRAHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.76k | £182.63k | £206.25k | £203.03k | £224.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.10k | £152.15k | £170.12k | £174.05k | £189.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £116.96k | £160.39k | £190.52k | £173.71k | £204.01k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 26 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 8TH JULY 2002 AS AMENDED 10 OCTOBER 2003, 27 DECEMBER 2002 AND 19 SEPTEMBER 2005. as amended on 20 Mar 2020 as amended on 20 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE REHABILITATION OF THE HOMELESS AND EX-PRISONERS INTO SOCIETY AND TO RELIEVE POVERTY, PARTICULARLY IN BOTH CASES, BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, SUPPORT AND ADVICE. 2. TO ADVANCE RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH A WAY THAT ITS MESSAGE BECOMES ACCESSIBLE AND COMPREHENSIBLE TO THOSE WHOM THE COMPANY SEEKS TO ASSIST.
Area of benefit
NORFOLK - BROADLAND/NORWICH - SPROWSTON, NORWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE HOUSE OF GENESIS
6 LAUNDRY CLOSE
NORWICH
NR7 0XH
- Phone:
- 01603435449
- Email:
- thogenesis@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window