MEDIATION BUCKINGHAMSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a community mediation service to residents of Buckinghamshire and surrounding areas. Trains volunteers as community mediators.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £17,500 from 3 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
36 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
- Slough
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 13 September 2002: Standard registration
- A to C (Working name)
- Alternatives to Conflict (Working name)
- ATOC (Working name)
- BUCKINGHAMSHIRE MEDIATION (Working name)
- BUCKS MEDIATION (Working name)
- MEDIATION BUCKS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Barry Churchill | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Amber Dawn Preen | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phyllida Alison Middlemiss | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda June Instone | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andy Christopher Kenward | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.08k | £52.35k | £68.14k | £72.07k | £154.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.15k | £47.48k | £66.28k | £107.84k | £147.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £3.90k | £11.50k | £17.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.25k | £24.00k | £7.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 MAY 2002 AS AMENDED 23 MARCH 2004 AND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC RESIDENT IN THE ADMINISTRATIVE AREA OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITH A VIEW TO PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC ORDER THE PROVISION OF SERVICES DIRECTED TOWARDS MEDIATION AND RECONCILIATION.
Area of benefit
ADMINISTRATIVE AREA OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Box
Des Box
East Richardson Street
HIGH WYCOMBE
Buckinghamshire
HP11 2GG
- Phone:
- 01494520821
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window