Accounts and annual returns STREETWISE 2000 PROJECT

Charity number: 1094449
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 24 November 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 May 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 06 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 06 January 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 20 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 20 September 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 17 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 01 November 2011 On Time