Financial history STREETWISE 2000 PROJECT

Charity number: 1094449
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £99.82k £126.97k £53.96k £137.37k £94.22k
Total expenditure £104.13k £110.69k £75.93k £102.70k £98.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A