STREETWISE 2000 PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Streetwise 2000 aims to provide an effective community based service to vulnerable young people. We support young people aged between 16 and 25, through the transition from adolescence to adulthood, which will enable them to achieve their full potential and lead meaningful lifestyles. We achieve this through a variety of one-to-one support, CBT, counselling, therapeutic group work and befriending.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bury
Governance
- 31 October 2002: Standard registration
- 23 December 2014: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 23 December 2014: Funds transferred to 1157194 STREETWISE 2000
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.82k | £126.97k | £53.96k | £137.37k | £94.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.13k | £110.69k | £75.93k | £102.70k | £98.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 24 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2014
(These accounts |
06 May 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 06 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 06 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 20 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 20 September 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 17 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 01 November 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 MARCH 2001 AS AMENDED 21 AUGUST 2002.
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIVE MAY IMPROVE.
Area of benefit
NOT APPLICABLE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window