CANARY WHARF CONTRACTORS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CONTINUING TO SUPPORT INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS LOCAL TO CANARY WHARF
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 April 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alec Vallintine | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Curran | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Giles Woolley | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £407.34k | £1.99k | £170.61k | £378.88k | £349.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £509.63k | £160.63k | £119.61k | £359.29k | £403.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 February 2022 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY GENERALLY BUT WITH SPECIAL REGARD TO PERSONS AND THEIR DEPENDANT FAMILIES WHO HAVE BEEN OR ARE EMPLOYED IN THE BUILDING AND ENGINEERING TRADES AND PROFESSIONS, 2)THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF PERSONS WHO, BY REASON OF THEIR WORK IN OR ASSOCIATION WITH THE BUILDING AND ENGINEERING TRADES, HAVE BECOME PARTIALLY OR TOTALLY INCAPACITATED THROUGH INJURY OR ILLNESS, 3) TO SUPPORT THE BEREAVED FAMILIES OF PERSONS WORKING IN THE BUILDING AND ENGINEERING TRADES OR WHO HAVE RETIRED BUT HAD PREVIOUSLY WORKED IN THE BUILDING AND ENGINEERING TRADES, 4) TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE HIGH EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING STANDARDS IN THE FIELDS OF BUILDING, ENGINEERING AND ARCHITECTURE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ruddy Joinery Ltd
Enterprise Way
Flitwick
Bedford
MK45 5BS
- Phone:
- 07803730360
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window