JUNO WOMEN'S AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting women and children or their dependants who are experiencing or have experienced domestic violence. Operating a 24 hour freephone helpline, a drop in service, outreach support for women and children, independent domestic violence advocate service, RISE support schemes, refuge provision, pets fostering scheme and domestic violence training for individuals and agencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,339,960
Donations and legacies | £28.37k | |
Charitable activities | £3.31m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £321 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,499,243
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.50m | |
Other | £0 |
£41,355 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £3,057,240 from 4 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.50m |
People

98 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 03 October 2002: Standard registration
- 15 April 2024: Funds received from 1082688 NOTTINGHAM PREGNANCY CRISIS CENTRE
- NOTTINGHAMSHIRE WOMENS AID ADVICE CENTRE (Working name)
- WOMEN'S AID ADVICE CENTRE (NOTTINGHAM) (Previous name)
- WOMEN'S AID INTEGRATED SERVICES (NOTTINGHAM AND REGION) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN GREGORY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Elizabeth Wakefield | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anne Leivers | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Whitehouse | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Whelan | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Tyrrell | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Henderson | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Harry | Trustee | 04 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Dunkwu | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Baxter | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucia Swift | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUE TONGUE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.10m | £2.45m | £2.80m | £3.16m | £3.34m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.12m | £2.42m | £2.93m | £3.14m | £3.50m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.92m | £2.16m | £2.69m | £2.93m | £3.06m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £120.21k | £70.75k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £9.58k | £76.09k | £11.15k | £88.36k | £28.37k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.70k | £2.92k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.09m | £2.37m | £2.79m | £3.07m | £3.31m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.23k | £1.31k | £35 | £66 | £321 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £25.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.12m | £2.42m | £2.93m | £3.14m | £3.50m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £703 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £18.68k | £22.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £23.56k | £80.71k | £157.95k | £146.27k | £101.68k | |
|
Long-term investments | £720.75k | £828.56k | £858.45k | £612.33k | £653.68k | |
|
Other assets | £657.72k | £874.17k | £776.56k | £832.99k | £658.03k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £127.99k | £373.66k | £486.69k | £317.25k | £256.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 MARCH 2009 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20 NOVEMBER 2009. as amended on 24 Jun 2019 as amended on 04 Aug 2022 as amended on 07 Jul 2022 as amended on 23 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
The Charity’s objects are specifically restricted to support and promote the protection and/or the well being of survivors and their children or dependants, and children and young people, who are experiencing or have experienced domestic violence and/or domestic abuse (including without limitation any acts or treatment which causes (whether intended as its effect or not) any emotional, physical, mental, sexual or financial distress.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Juno Women's Aid
Heathcote Building
Heathcoat Street
Nottingham
NG1 3AA
- Phone:
- 01158221775
- Email:
- Finance@wais.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window