Governing document BRITISH SOCIETY OF ECHOCARDIOGRAPHY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/07/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/10/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/10/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 NOV 2016 as amended on 19 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
1) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE EFFECTIVE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND THE PROMOTION OF BEST PRACTICE IN ECHOCARDIOGRAPHY IN RELATION TO THE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF HEART DISEASE; B) PROMOTING HIGH STANDARDS OF PROFESSIONAL COMPETENCE IN ECHOCARDIOGRAPHY FOR THE PROTECTION AND BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; C) PROVIDING OR FACILITATING TRAINING FOR THOSE INVOLVED IN THE PRACTICE OF ECHOCARDIOGRAPHY 2) TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE AND CARRY ON STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO ECHOCARDIOGRAPHY AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH; WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE REPUBLIC OF IRELAND
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND THE REPUBLIC OF IRELAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.