THE MAIDSTONE U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
U3A meet monthly at a hall in Maidstone town centre, with visiting speakers giving talks on a variety of subjects. There are 190 members, with some 30 interest groups, who also meet monthly, generally in members homes, on weekday mornings or afternoons. All members receive a monthly newsletter.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kent
Governance
- 07 August 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Rix | Chair | 31 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mary Winder | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Drury | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Drury | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carole Burke | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Howard Russell | Trustee | 31 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Cocks | Trustee | 31 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
JAMES DOWNER | Trustee | 31 August 2010 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN BUSH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.31k | £2.14k | £4.62k | £13.61k | £9.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.45k | £2.04k | £5.95k | £11.28k | £9.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 July 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 SEPTEMBER 2001. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Old School Place
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME14 1EQ
- Phone:
- 07919485499
- Email:
- Stephenbush.u3a@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window