LUX

Charity number: 1094936
Charity reporting is up to date (33 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The promotion of artists' moving image work through distribution, exhibition, publishing and research. To promote, maintain, improve and advance education in the arts, particularly the arts of film and video making and other moving image arts for the public benefit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 December 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maria Palacios Cruz Trustee 20 January 2025
None on record
Remi Lacroix Trustee 17 October 2024
None on record
Myriam Mouflih Trustee 15 October 2024
None on record
Melissa Gronlund Trustee 02 October 2024
None on record
Harry Fisher-Jones Trustee 18 June 2024
None on record
Catharine Des Forges Trustee 22 February 2024
None on record
Joanna Fraga Mamede Trustee 16 March 2022
None on record
Xavier Alexandre Pillai Trustee 23 February 2022
None on record
Colm Patrick Gou-Lin Peare Trustee 23 February 2022
None on record
Alia Syed Trustee 24 February 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £731.01k £682.45k £840.21k £868.76k £745.71k
Total expenditure £721.96k £690.77k £740.69k £765.72k £867.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £31.09k £310.34k £223.22k £168.55k
Income - Donations and legacies £202.90k £238.09k £285.94k £205.86k £206.47k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £526.80k £433.43k £554.10k £645.52k £495.66k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.31k £493 £172 £706 £1.70k
Income - Other £0 £10.44k £0 £16.68k £41.88k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £721.96k £690.77k £740.69k £765.72k £867.92k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.14k £21.81k £28.84k £29.45k £49.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £19.72k £7.14k £18.51k £12.54k £8.93k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £475.36k £532.94k £603.37k £692.50k £792.06k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £112.81k £166.13k £148.40k £128.52k £346.68k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 March 2025 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 05 March 2025 33 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 February 2024 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 16 February 2024 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
L U X
Waterlow Park Centre
Dartmouth Park Hill
LONDON
N19 5JF
Phone:
02031412960