GOODWIN DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children & Youngs Peoples Services, Community Services (Safer, Stronger Communities), Enterprise Employment & Training Services, Health & Social Care Provision.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£4,240,500
Donations and legacies | £11.50k | |
Charitable activities | £2.27m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £704.00k | |
Other | £1.25m |
Total expenditure:
£4,077,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £4.08m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,028,000 from 3 government contract(s) and £174,000 from 12 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.08m | |
Retained for future use | £163.50k |
People

143 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
116 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 11 July 2003: Standard registration
- 18 April 2012: Funds received from 1119227 DANNY'S DREAM
- HULL AMBASSABORS (Working name)
- HULL COMMUNITY WARDENS GOODWIN CENTRE (Working name)
- SURE START HYTON & ST ANDREWS SURE START NEWLAND & (Working name)
- WEST HULL COMMUNITY TRANSPORT (Working name)
- GOODWIN DEVELOPMENT TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Homes England
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Halls | Chair | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daren Hale | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Wells | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sana Benali | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Michael Harrison | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marija Berin | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kellock Ainley | Trustee | 23 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Altynay Peak | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.76m | £4.70m | £4.63m | £4.71m | £4.24m | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.11m | £4.60m | £4.88m | £4.78m | £4.08m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £705.72k | £755.65k | £756.00k | £803.44k | £1.03m | |
|
Income from government grants | £640.27k | £352.82k | £418.00k | £184.32k | £174.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £11.50k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £664.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.00m | £4.31m | £4.63m | £4.71m | £2.27m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £704.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £90.00k | £389.00k | £0 | £0 | £1.25m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.27m | £4.59m | £4.88m | £4.78m | £4.08m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £14.00k | £14.00k | £20.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £3.84m | £8.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £9.82m | £9.61m | £9.61m | £9.63m | £9.32m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £983.00k | £1.46m | £497.00k | £512.00k | £511.00k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.35m | £4.51m | £3.80m | £4.04m | £3.70m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 JUN 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 DEC 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 MAY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 MAY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 NOV 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 MAR 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 OCT 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 MAR 2014 as amended on 09 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE. PRINCIPALLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF KINGSTON UPON HULL, AND IN PARTICULAR : 3.1.1 TO PROVIDE, CONSTRUCT, IMPROVE OR MANAGE SOCIAL HOUSING FOR PERSONS IN NEED TOGETHER WITH ANY OTHER AMENITIES OF FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF SUCH SOCIAL HOUSING EITHER EXCLUSIVELY OR TOGETHER WITH PERSONS WHO ARE NOT RESIDENTS OF SUCH SOCIAL HOUSING. 3.1.2 PROVIDE ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO ALL RESIDENTS OF SOCIAL HOUSING PROVIDED, OWNED AND MANAGED BY THE COMPANY OR ANY OTHER ORGANISATION OR PERSON AND APPLICANTS FOR SOCIAL HOUSING AND APPLICANTS FOR SOCIAL HOUSING ADVICE. 3.1.3 CARRY OUT ANY ACTIVITY WHICH IS BOTH CONNECTED WITH, OR INCIDENTAL TO, THE COMPANY’S CHARITABLE OBJECTIVES IN ARTICLES 3.1.1 AND 3.1.2 INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO 3.1.3.1 SECURING THAT AND BUILDINGS ARE BOUGHT INTO EFFECTIVE USE, AND 3.1.3.2 CREATING AN ATTRACTIVE AND SAFE ENVIRONMENT. 3.1.4 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION OPPORTUNITIES AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES, IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE 3.1.5 TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY: 3.1.5.1 PROVIDING OR IMPROVING, OR ASSISTING IN PROVIDING OR IMPROVING ACCESS TO TRAINING, RETRAINING AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES 3.1.5.2 ASSISTING PEOPLE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT, PROVIDING EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES OR PROVIDING WORK EXPERIENCE 3.1.5.3 PROVIDING PRACTICAL SUPPORT TO PEOPLE WHO ARE UNEMPLOYED OR UNDERTAKING TRAINING 3.1.5.4 PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING IN EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEEDS; AND 3.1.5.5 CREATING TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKING SPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS. 3.1.6 TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE, OR TO ASSIST IN PROVIDING OR IMPROVING RECREATIONAL OR LEISURE TIME FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE WHO NEED SUCH FACILITIES BECAUSE OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES 3.1.7 THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS 3.1.8 THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME BY MEANS OF THE PREVENTION, REDUCTION AND DETERRENCE OF CRIME, NUISANCE, ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR VANDALISM, TRESPASS, ARSON AND THEFT 3.1.9 ESTABLISHING, MANAGING AND MAINTAINING A COMMUNITY RESOURCE CENTRE AND MAKING FACILITIES IN SUCH A CENTRE AVAILABLE IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE WHO NEED THOSE FACILITIES BECAUSE OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; AND 3.1.10 THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT INCLUDING BY 3.1.10.1 RESTORING OR RECLAIMING LAND WHICH CANNOT BE OTHERWISE BE USED FOR ECONOMIC SOCIAL OR ENVIRONMENTAL PURPOSES BY REASON OF POLLUTION OR DAMAGE CAUSED BY AN ACTIVITY PREVIOUSLY CARRIED OUT ON THE LAND 3.1.10.2 PREVENTING OR REDUCING ANY POTENTIAL CAUSES OF POLLUTION IN RELATION TO ANY LAND WHICH HAS SUFFERED OR MAY SUFFER POLLUTION AS A RESULT OF AN ACTIVITY PREVIOUSLY CARRIED OUT ON THE LAND 3.1.10.3 REMEDYING OR MITIGATING THE EFFECTS OF ANY POLLUTION IN RELATION TO LAND WHICH HAS SUFFERED OR MAY SUFFER POLLUTION AS A RESULT OF AN ACTIVITY PREVIOUSLY CARRIED OUT ON THE LAND, 3.1.10.4 THE CONSERVATION OR PROMOTION OF BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY THROUGH (1) THE PROVISION, CONSERVATION, RESTORATION OR ENHANCEMENT OF A NATURAL HABITAT, OR (2) THE MAINTENANCE OR RECOVERY OF A SPECIES IN ITS NATURAL HABITAT 3.1.10.5 THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE OR IMPROVEMENT OF PUBLIC AMENITIES INCLUDING OPEN SPACES OR OTHER OPEN RECREATIONAL FACILITIES, OR 3.1.10.6 THE MAINTENANCE REPAIR OR RESTORATION OF ANY BUILDING OR STRUCTURE WHICH IS OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST OR IS A PLACE OF RELIGIOUS WORSHIP 3.2 EQUAL OPPORTUNITIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS THE COMPANY SHALL AT ALL TIMES TAKE INTO CONSIDERATION THE PRINCIPLES OF EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY
Area of benefit
PRINCIPALLY, THE CITY OF HULL
Contact information
- Address:
-
GOODWIN DEVELOPMENT TRUST LTD
Pod 5 The Octagon
Walker Street
HULL
HU3 2RA
- Phone:
- 01482587550
- Email:
- info@goodwintrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window