Financial history THE LISTENING EAR

Charity number: 1095964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.71k £44.96k £149.13k £129.41k £92.06k
Total expenditure £13.78k £39.46k £107.19k £134.42k £112.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £47.05k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A