Accounts and annual returns ROSPA SOUTHERN MOTORCYCLE ADVANCED RIDER TRAINING

Charity Number: 1094067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 02 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 11 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 17 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 17 October 2022 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 18 October 2021 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required