Financial history ROSPA SOUTHERN MOTORCYCLE ADVANCED RIDER TRAINING

Charity Number: 1094067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £5.13k £6.18k £5.34k £6.66k £6.73k
Total expenditure £2.63k £3.31k £8.00k £7.76k £9.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A