ROSPA SOUTHERN MOTORCYCLE ADVANCED RIDER TRAINING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Southern Riders is a regional group of RoSPA affiliated Advanced Drivers And Riders (RoADAR). Our Group is exclusively geared to advanced motorcycle training and has members from all walks of life who ride all makes and types of motorcycle.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
- Kent
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 07 October 2002: Standard registration
- RoSPA Advanced Drivers and Riders - Southern Riders (Working name)
- ROSPA SMART (Previous name)
- ROSPA SOUTHERN MOTOCYCLE ADVANCED RIDER TRAINING (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Buttery | Chair | 16 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Baker | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jupp | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Tovee | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.13k | £6.18k | £5.34k | £6.66k | £6.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.63k | £3.31k | £8.00k | £7.76k | £9.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 October 2022 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 October 2021 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 MAR 2002 AS AMENDED ON 16 SEP 2002 AS AMENDED ON 16 NOV 2004 AS AMENDED ON 14 NOV 2005 AS AMENDED ON 03 NOV 2006 AS AMENDED ON 15 OCT 2009 AS AMENDED ON 22 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE GROUP SHALL BE TO ENCOURAGE INTEREST IN ROAD SAFETY, TO IMPROVE RIDING STANDARDS AND IN PARTICULAR TO HELP RIDERS PASS THE ROSPA ADVANCED DRIVERS AND RIDERS ASSOCIATION (HEREINAFTER CALLED ‘ROADAR) TEST.
Area of benefit
SUSSEX - SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yew Tree Cottage
Witherenden Hill
Burwash
ETCHINGHAM
East Sussex
TN19 7JN
- Phone:
- 01737932541
- Email:
- secretary@southernriders.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window