HELPING HANDS FOR THE NEEDY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IN LIQUIDATION THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, AND IN PARTICULAR, THOSE AFFECTED BY NATURAL CAUSES OR BY WARS AND CONFLICTS, FOREIGN AND DOMESTIC BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER ASSISTANCE INCLUDING MEDICINES, HOSPITALS, SHELTER, FOOD, CLOTHING, SANITATION AND CLEAN DRINKING WATER.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
- Egypt
- Eritrea
- India
- Indonesia
- Iran
- Iraq
- Israel
- Lebanon
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- Sudan
Governance
- 06 November 2002: Standard registration
- 03 October 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.37m | £1.43m | £1.24m | £850.44k | £376.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.38m | £1.43m | £1.37m | £744.42k | £380.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £1.50m | £850.44k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14TH JUNE 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3 NOVEMBER 2002. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 4TH NOVEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, AND IN PARTICULAR, THOSE AFFECTED BY NATURAL CAUSES OR BY WARS AND CONFLICTS, FOREIGN AND DOMESTIC BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER ASSISTANCE INCLUDING MEDICINES, HOSPITALS, SHELTER, FOOD, CLOTHING, SANITATION AND CLEAN DRINKING WATER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window