HONEYCROFT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An inclusive children's charity providing for under 11 year olds and their families. It operates 50 weeks a year, from 8am till 6pm, with a pre-school group, breakfast and after-school club, holiday club and pre-playgroup for children with special needs. It offers training and volunteering opportunities, offers a special needs toy library and provides internal and external creche services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £154,482 from 17 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 18 September 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve MCGEOUGH | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Gaston | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christine Brady | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £361.18k | £365.87k | £286.05k | £293.28k | £339.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £301.20k | £296.86k | £324.00k | £308.24k | £331.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £151.91k | £98.80k | £136.72k | £12.27k | £154.48k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 February 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 February 2023 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 March 2021 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 March 2021 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 8TH JANUARY 2002
Charitable objects
1) TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE EDUCATION AND CARE FOR CHILDREN IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT THROUGH PLAY AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES 2) TO HELP AND EDUCATE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION, THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MIGHT GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED 3) TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE EDUCATION AND SUPPORT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS, OR WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FOR OTHER REASONS, THROUGH INTEGRATION AND INCLUSION INTO MAINSTREAM SERVICE PROVISION 4) TO PROVIDE SUCH SUPPORT TO PARENTS AND CARERS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE REFERRED TO IN THE ABOVE OBJECTS AS WILL ASSIST IN THE PURSUIT OF THOSE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CENTRE CO ORDINATOR
ST. BARNABAS HALL
SACKVILLE ROAD
HOVE
EAST SUSSEX
BN3 3WF
- Phone:
- 01273220323
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window