CARE.ABILITY LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 July 2002: Standard registration
- 03 October 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £158.34k | £136.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £156.74k | £134.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 28 October 2008 | 271 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 24 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 16 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 07 November 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 27 April 2005 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 22 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 JUNE 2002.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF DISABLED PERSONS, PROMOTING THEIR INTEGRATION WITHIN THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE REPRESENTATION AND ADVOCACY INCLUDING RECORDED CASSETTES FOR THE VISUALLY HANDICAPPED AND NEWSLETTERS FOR THE DISABLED, THE HEARING IMPAIRED AND CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS, THE PROVISION OF TRANSPORT TO GROUPS AND INDIVIDUALS AND ANY ADDITIONAL SERVICES WHICH MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND NORTHERN IRELAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window