Accounts and annual returns THE SAVOY THEATRE (MONMOUTH) DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1102792
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2010 18 October 2011 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 18 October 2011 80 days late
Annual return 31 December 2009 14 April 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 07 April 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2008 11 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 18 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required