TRESWELL VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides the local community with the space and facilities to hold community events, fund raising activies, meeting place for groups such as Yoga, Ballroom Dancing and Irish Dancing Group, Art Groups, Knitting and Crafts, Bingo etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 20 November 2002: Standard registration
- TRESWELL COMMUNITY TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Selina Cope | Chair | 01 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Julie Hughes | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Hardie | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mary Lazenby | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Lazenby | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosie May Cope | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Andrew Cope | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.89k | £24.07k | £20.31k | £13.45k | £9.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.15k | £6.41k | £12.84k | £16.37k | £12.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.29k | £10.83k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 18 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: 1) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND 2) OTHER FORMS OFV RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF TRESWELL AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Treswell Village Hall
Town Street
Treswell
RETFORD
Nottinghamshire
DN22 0EG
- Phone:
- 07891696050
- Email:
- katehardie@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window