Governing document THE PERSHORE AND DISTRICT U3A

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED 15 OCTOBER 2002 AS AMENDED ON 15 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20 NOV 2018 as amended on 16 Nov 2021 as amended on 16 Jan 2024 as amended on 21 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
PERSHORE, IN THE COUNTY OF WORCESTERSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.