Trustees THE PERSHORE AND DISTRICT U3A
Charity number: 1093328

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daina Gromadzki | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Helen Barrett | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemarie Ann Chandler | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ingrid Fox | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Wright | Trustee | 11 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Whyte | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Smith | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Greer | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.